MO HB555 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts motorcyclists 21 years of age and older from wearing a helmet when operating a motorcycle or motortricycle and allows a temporary motorcycle instruction permit holder to renew the permit two additional times
Title
Exempts motorcyclists 21 years of age and older from wearing a helmet when operating a motorcycle or motortricycle and allows a temporary motorcycle instruction permit holder to renew the permit two additional times
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 16, 2013, 9:45AM, PERSHING CONFERENCE ROOM |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 15, 2013, 8:00AM, SCR 1 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S) |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-05-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 63 |
2013-05-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-05-02 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2013-05-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-30 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 114 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-04-30 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |