MO HB547 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires each judicial circuit to establish a veterans' treatment court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires each judicial circuit to establish a veterans' treatment court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 547 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 104 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 547 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 547 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: HB 547 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 149 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2019-07-09HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-05-17HouseHouse Message (H)
2019-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-17HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS as amended AYES: 104 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-17HouseTaken Up
2019-05-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-05-17HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-05-17SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended
2019-05-17SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1
2019-05-17SenateTaken Up
2019-05-09SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-05-08SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-05-08SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-05-06SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 8, 2019, 12:00pm, Bingham Conference Room, Amended time change
2019-05-01SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-05-01SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2019-05-01SenateTaken Up
2019-04-18SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-18SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-16SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 18, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2019-04-15SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-04-11SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-09SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-09SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-04SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 9, 2019, 1:00pm, SCR 1
2019-04-02SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 2, 2019, 12:00pm, SCR 1
2019-03-26SenateSecond read and referred: Veterans and Military Affairs(S)
2019-03-14HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-03-14HouseThird Read and Passed (H)
2019-03-14HouseTaken Up
2019-03-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-11HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2019-03-06HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-03-05HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 2 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended adopted
2019-03-05HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-03-05HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-03-05HouseTaken Up
2019-02-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-20HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-20HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-19HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-23HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2019-01-14HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB547&year=2019&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1004H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1004H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1004H.02P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1004S.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1004S.03T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/038.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.066.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.065.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.064.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6805171607-1684.pdf#1653
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6905171607-1684.pdf#1653

Bill Comments

feedback