MO HB540 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Senior Services Growth and Development Program to provide additional funding for senior services
Title
Establishes the Senior Services Growth and Development Program to provide additional funding for senior services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2017-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |