MO HB54 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the provision that requires a political party's emblem to be printed on an election ballot above the party caption
Title
Repeals the provision that requires a political party's emblem to be printed on an election ballot above the party caption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-03-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-22 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2011-02-08 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB54&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0054I.htm |