MO HB536 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that the Mid-America Port Commission must have one commissioner appointed by the Governor and two elected from the county commissions of the commission's jurisdiction from specific port authorities
Title
Specifies that the Mid-America Port Commission must have one commissioner appointed by the Governor and two elected from the county commissions of the commission's jurisdiction from specific port authorities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - HB 536 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 29, 2015, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |