MO HB534 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows local educational agencies to create school-community partnerships

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows local educational agencies to create school-community partnerships

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-04-08HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-04-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-02HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-02HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-23HouseReferred: Special Committee on Student Accountability(H)
2019-01-14HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback