MO HB533 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that if a candidate withdraws from an election within two days of the filing deadline, the deadline must be extended
Title
Specifies that if a candidate withdraws from an election within two days of the filing deadline, the deadline must be extended
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - HB 533 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 150 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 13, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2015-03-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-03-03 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |