MO HB53 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Referred: Downsizing State Government(H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Referred: Downsizing State Government(H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Governor to maintain and regularly update a list of each state board, commission, committee, or council that contains members appointed by the Governor.
Title
Requires the Governor to maintain and regularly update a list of each state board, commission, committee, or council that contains members appointed by the Governor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB53&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0036H.01I.pdf |