MO HB529 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a minimum biodiesel fuel content mandate for diesel fuel sold or offered for sale in Missouri

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a minimum biodiesel fuel content mandate for diesel fuel sold or offered for sale in Missouri

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-23HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-02-23HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-23HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-09HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-28HouseReferred: Agriculture Policy(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-15HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB529&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1283H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1283H.03C.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1283H03.01H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1283H03.03H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1283H03.04H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1283H03.05H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1283H03.06H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1283H03.07H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0529I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1283H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1283H.03C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0529C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback