MO HB529 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurers to file own risk and solvency assessment summary reports with the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration
Title
Requires insurers to file own risk and solvency assessment summary reports with the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration
Sponsors
Rep. Don Gosen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - HB 529 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 6, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 14, 2015, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Insurance(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Property, Casualty, and Life Insurance(H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |