MO HB522 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding bridge and highway designations
Title
Changes the laws regarding bridge and highway designations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - HB 522 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 133 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - HB 522 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 132 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - HB 522 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - HB 522 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 132 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - HB 522 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-06-25 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-27 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 132 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 33 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) - Returned to committee of origin Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety |
2015-04-15 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS for HB 34, HB 133, HB 134, HB 810, HB 338 & HB 873 voted do pass consent |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 13, 2015, 3:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-31 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 3 |
2015-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-30 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |