MO HB519 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the statute of limitations for certain actions to recover damages regarding child abuse and sexual offenses committed against a child and allows prosecutions for child abuse to be commenced at any time.
Title
Removes the statute of limitations for certain actions to recover damages regarding child abuse and sexual offenses committed against a child and allows prosecutions for child abuse to be commenced at any time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |