MO HB519 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state employers to suspend pay or charge annual or sick leave if employees are placed on administrative leave for more than fifteen days
Title
Requires state employers to suspend pay or charge annual or sick leave if employees are placed on administrative leave for more than fifteen days
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Vescovo [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - HB 519 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - HB 519 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 115 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - HB 519 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - HB 519 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 115 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - HB 519 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 30 2015, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 118 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency(H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |