MO HB514 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Malcolm X Day Commission to organize activities and events in honor of the civil rights leader
Title
Establishes the Malcolm X Day Commission to organize activities and events in honor of the civil rights leader
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB514&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0312H.01I.pdf |