MO HB514 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Leara [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - HB 514 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 100 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 514 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 105 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - HB 514 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 514 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 105 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - HB 514 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-06-22 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 100 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-06 | House | House Concurs (H) - SA 1 AYES: 105 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-05-06 | House | Taken Up |
2015-05-06 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 1 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) - SA 1 adopted |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 23, 2015, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 8, 2015, noon or upon morning adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention(H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |