MO HB513 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Substitute) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Substitute) [PDF]
Summary
Creates several new state designations
Title
Creates several new state designations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | HS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | HS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-02-24 | House | Committed to: Legislative Review(H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |