MO HB513 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding business filing fees
Title
Changes the laws regarding business filing fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 513 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 513 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 513 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, May 7, 2015, 9:00am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-30 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-30 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-03-03 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 18 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Small Business(H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |