MO HB511 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to the collection and retention of fees by certain motor vehicle licensing offices.
Title
Modifies provisions related to the collection and retention of fees by certain motor vehicle licensing offices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB511&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0268H.01I.pdf |