MO HB509 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school districts to create magnet schools and changes provisions regarding the powers of superintendents
Title
Allows school districts to create magnet schools and changes provisions regarding the powers of superintendents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB509&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0337H.01I.pdf |