MO HB506 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the tax credit for wine production
Title
Changes the laws regarding the tax credit for wine production
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Zerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - HB 506 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 29, 2015, noon or upo0n morning adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 118 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention(H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |