MO HB50 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes division designations for circuit and associate courts in the Sixteenth Judicial Circuit
Title
Changes division designations for circuit and associate courts in the Sixteenth Judicial Circuit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: HB 50 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: HB 50 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: HB 50 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: HB 50 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: HB 50 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-07-05 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-04-26 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-04-26 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 145 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-03-15 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass Consent (S) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass Consent |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 13, 2017, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2017-03-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-01 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-27 | House | Perfected (H) |
2017-02-27 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-02-27 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-02-27 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-01-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |