MO HB489 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Second read and referred: Government Reform(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Second read and referred: Government Reform(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding punitive damages.
Title
Modifies provisions regarding punitive damages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: HB 489 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: HB 489 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: HB 489 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: HB 489 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: HB 489 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Government Reform(S) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-05-01 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-05-01 | House | Taken Up |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-04-29 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-29 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-29 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |