MO HB48 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts motor fuel used to operate school buses transporting students for educational purposes from the motor fuel tax and requires the establishment of a uniform and simplified rule for all exemptions
Title
Exempts motor fuel used to operate school buses transporting students for educational purposes from the motor fuel tax and requires the establishment of a uniform and simplified rule for all exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB48&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0048I.htm |