MO HB475 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - Public Hearing Cancelled (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - Public Hearing Cancelled (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding health care quality data standardization and transparency and establishes criteria for programs of insurers to compare the quality and cost efficiency of health care providers
Title
Changes the laws regarding health care quality data standardization and transparency and establishes criteria for programs of insurers to compare the quality and cost efficiency of health care providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Public Hearing Cancelled (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Public Hearing Cancelled (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-30 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2011-03-30 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-03-30 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-22 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-14 | Referred: Health Insurance (H) | |
2011-02-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |