MO HB471 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Education and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Education and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows state agencies to create incentive programs for employees
Title
Allows state agencies to create incentive programs for employees
Sponsors
Rep. John Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SCS HCS HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: HB 471 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 17 NV: 23 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: HB 471 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 17 NV: 23 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 25, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education and Workforce Development(S) |
2023-04-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-04-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 107 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 23 |
2023-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 and HA 2, adopted. |
2023-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-04-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |