MO HB471 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the third week of February as "Engineers Awareness Week" in Missouri
Title
Designates the third week of February as "Engineers Awareness Week" in Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 6 |
2013-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2013-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources(H) |
2013-02-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |