MO HB469 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to high school equivalency degree testing
Title
Modifies the law relating to high school equivalency degree testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - HB 469 (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 4, 2017, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 25, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 11, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-27 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-03-27 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |