MO HB459 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Executive Session Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Executive Session Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the new Interstate 70 Mississippi River Bridge connecting downtown St. Louis and southwestern Illinois as the "Jerry F. Costello - William 'Bill' Clay Sr. Veterans Memorial Bridge"
Title
Designates the new Interstate 70 Mississippi River Bridge connecting downtown St. Louis and southwestern Illinois as the "Jerry F. Costello - William 'Bill' Clay Sr. Veterans Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2011-03-16 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-16 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-28 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-02-24 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-22 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-22 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-22 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |