MO HB458 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - House Message (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - House Message (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding bullying in schools and establishes specific components that a district must include in its antibullying policy
Title
Changes the laws regarding bullying in schools and establishes specific components that a district must include in its antibullying policy
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - House - HB 458 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 129 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 458 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 130 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - HB 458 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 121 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - HB 458 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 110 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 458 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 130 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - HB 458 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 121 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - HB 458 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 110 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-05-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 129 NOES: 19 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-11 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-05-06 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2015-05-04 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2015-04-30 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS SCHMITT, ONDER, SILVEY, NASHEED, SCHUPP |
2015-04-30 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES ALLEN, HIGDON, FLANIGAN, MONTECILLO, COLONA |
2015-04-30 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2015-04-30 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2015-04-28 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-04-28 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SS as amended |
2015-04-28 | House | Taken Up |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS AS AMENDED |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 5 ADOPTED AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 15, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 8, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 121 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 TO HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED |
2015-03-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2015-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |