MO HB452 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred: Children and Families(H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred: Children and Families(H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts the retail sale of food from state and local sales and use tax
Title
Exempts the retail sale of food from state and local sales and use tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB452&year=2023&code=R |
Text | http://reflect.legiscan.com/Proxy.php |
Supplement | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/sumpdf/HB0452I.pdf |