MO HB438 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the requirements to run for certain public office.
Title
Changes the requirements to run for certain public office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House: HB 438 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: HB 438 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 99 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: HB 438 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 99 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 10, 2019, 1:00pm, SCR 1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-03-25 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-13 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-13 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |