MO HB433 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law regarding certificates of need.
Title
Modifies the law regarding certificates of need.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB433&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1066H.01I.pdf |