MO HB424 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to department of revenue and establishes the "License Office Distribution Fund"
Title
Modifies provisions relating to department of revenue and establishes the "License Office Distribution Fund"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - House - House: HB 424 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 50 NV: 13 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: HB 424 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 94 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: HB 424 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 94 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 10, 2023, 9:30 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 25, 2023, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S) |
2023-04-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-04-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 85 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 13 |
2023-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1, as amended, adopted. |
2023-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-04-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred: Transportation Infrastructure(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |