MO HB422 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that boards and commissions under the Division of Professional Registration may issue certain opinions for educational purposes
Title
Specifies that boards and commissions under the Division of Professional Registration may issue certain opinions for educational purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - HB 422 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 4, 2015, 12:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-17 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2015-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |