MO HB41 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-17 - Referred: Elections(H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-17 - Referred: Elections(H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires proof of identity and status as a United States natural born citizen for a candidate for the Office of President or Vice President to be submitted with other required certification documents to the Secretary of State
Title
Requires proof of identity and status as a United States natural born citizen for a candidate for the Office of President or Vice President to be submitted with other required certification documents to the Secretary of State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB41&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0041I.htm |