MO HB40 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-10 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-10 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Amber Alert System Oversight Committee to adopt criteria to expand the Amber Alert System to provide peace officer safety alerts
Title
Requires the Amber Alert System Oversight Committee to adopt criteria to expand the Amber Alert System to provide peace officer safety alerts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB40&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0491H.01I.pdf |