MO HB388 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Department of Revenue to send first class mail instead of certified mail.
Title
Allows the Department of Revenue to send first class mail instead of certified mail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-10 | House | Prefiled (H) |