MO HB38 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of altering or falsifying drug or alcohol test results or selling or transporting a biological sample or adulterant to falsify test results
Title
Creates the crime of altering or falsifying drug or alcohol test results or selling or transporting a biological sample or adulterant to falsify test results
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Roorda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB38&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0038I.htm |