MO HB379 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the department of natural resources to award grants to preserve, protect, or restore historic county courthouses and historic county courthouse grounds.
Title
Allows the department of natural resources to award grants to preserve, protect, or restore historic county courthouses and historic county courthouse grounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House: HB 379 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 146 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-09 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |