MO HB378 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires animal-drawn vehicles to have reflective material on the front of such vehicles
Title
Requires animal-drawn vehicles to have reflective material on the front of such vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |