MO HB375 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding agriculture
Title
Changes the laws regarding agriculture
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - HB 375 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 140 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2015-04-21 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |