MO HB369 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the "Back the Blue" license plate
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the "Back the Blue" license plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SCS HCS HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-19 | House | Referred: Transportation Infrastructure(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |