MO HB368 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Missouri Veterans Commission to issue an identification card to each veteran in the state who applies and provides proof of his or her military service
Title
Requires the Missouri Veterans Commission to issue an identification card to each veteran in the state who applies and provides proof of his or her military service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: Veterans (H) | |
2011-01-31 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB368&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0368I.htm |