MO HB350 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to the sale of kratom products
Title
Creates new provisions relating to the sale of kratom products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House: HB 350 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 30, Noon or uupon morning recess |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 7 |
2021-02-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-02-08 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-02-08 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-02-08 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-02-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-01-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |