MO HB346 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to diversion for criminal cases involving driving under the influence of alcohol
Title
Establishes provisions relating to diversion for criminal cases involving driving under the influence of alcohol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2023-04-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |