MO HB34 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-12 - Gov Took no Action, Sent to Sec of State/Article 3 Sec 31(H)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-12 - Gov Took no Action, Sent to Sec of State/Article 3 Sec 31(H)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the way that the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations determines the prevailing hourly rate of wages on public work projects
Title
Changes the way that the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations determines the prevailing hourly rate of wages on public work projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | House | Gov Took no Action, Sent to Sec of State/Article 3 Sec 31(H) |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-06 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 93 NOES: 64 |
2013-05-06 | House | House Concurs (H) - SS#2 ADOPTED AYES: 93 NOES: 65 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 23 NOES: 10 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SS PENDING |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Amended, Wednesday, April 17, 2012, Upon Evening Adjournment or Recess, SCR 1 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2013, Upon afternoon adjournment, SCR 1 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 89 NOES: 59 |
2013-02-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 89 NOES: 59 |
2013-02-27 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2013-02-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-01-30 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-01-30 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-01-23 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-01-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |