MO HB339 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an uninsured motorist to forfeit recovery of noneconomic loss under specified circumstances
Title
Requires an uninsured motorist to forfeit recovery of noneconomic loss under specified circumstances
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Wieland [R] | Rep. Don Gosen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Votes to Override Veto (S) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Votes to Override Veto (S) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | House Message (H) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | House Votes to Override Veto (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 51 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-09-11 | Senate | House Votes to Override Veto (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 51 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 30, 2013, UPON MORNING RECESS OR ADJOURNMENT, SCR 1 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 55 |
2013-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 101 NOES: 57 |
2013-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |