MO HB332 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-02 - Referred: Agriculture Policy (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-02 - Referred: Agriculture Policy (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Puppy Mill Cruelty Prevention Act to apply to humane societies and exempts shelters, pounds, kennels, pet shops, dealers, facilities, and breeders licensed prior to November 2, 2011
Title
Expands the Puppy Mill Cruelty Prevention Act to apply to humane societies and exempts shelters, pounds, kennels, pet shops, dealers, facilities, and breeders licensed prior to November 2, 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | Referred: Agriculture Policy (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB332&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0332I.htm |