MO HB330 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes employees' right to compensation for unused vacation leave at end of employment.
Title
Establishes employees' right to compensation for unused vacation leave at end of employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB330&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0513H.01I.pdf |