MO HB307 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding real property assessments to require presumptions in favor of the property owner in valuation hearings
Title
Changes the laws regarding real property assessments to require presumptions in favor of the property owner in valuation hearings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-21 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB307&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0600H.01I.pdf |